CA SB842 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-13 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-08-13 - Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 305, 2558, 2574, 8220.1, 8235, 8265, 8265.5, 8357, 8483.7, 8483.76, 14041, 14501, 17078.54, 33127, 41020, 41024, 41203.1, 41326, 41344.1, 41376.1, 41544, 42238, 42238.02, 42238.05, 42238.1, 42238.2, 42238.5, 42285, 46380, 46392, 47614.5, 47633, 47635, 47663, 48000, 48310, 48359.5, 48900, 52060, 52062, 52064, 52064.5, 52066, 52068, 52071.5, 52072, 52072.5, 52074, 53070, 53071, 53073, 53075, 53076, 56122, 56140, 56194, 56195.3, 56195.9, 56205, 56366.1, 56836.02, 56836.08, 56836.11, 56836.23, 56836.31, 56836.165, 60604.5, 60643, 60810, 88821, 88822, 88823, 88825, and 88826 of, to amend the heading of Article 15.4 (commencing with Section 8347) of Chapter 2 of Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, to amend the heading of Article 4.5 (commencing with Section 52060) of Chapter 6.1 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, to add Sections 216, 313.3, 2575.2, 8235.5, 33315, 41339.2, 52059.5, 52064.1, 52073, 52073.1, 52073.2, 53070.1, 53071.1, 53076.2, 53076.4, 56205.5, 56836.24, 56836.25, 88827, 88828, 88829, 88830, 88831, 88832, and 88833 to, to add Article 23.5 (commencing with Section 8492) to Chapter 2 of Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 17375) to Chapter 3 of Part 10.5 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 41570) to Chapter 3.2 of Part 24 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to add and repeal Article 22 (commencing with Section 8460) of Chapter 2 of Part 6 of Division 1 of Title 1 of, to add and repeal Article 16 (commencing with Section 44415) of Chapter 2 of Part 25 of Division 3 of Title 2 of, to repeal Sections 49430.5, 52051.5, 52052.1, 52052.3, 52052.5, 52052.6, 52052.9, 53203, and 60601 of, to repeal Article 4.2 (commencing with Section 52059) of Chapter 6.1 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of, and to repeal and add Sections 52052 and 52071 of, the Education Code, to amend Sections 7906, 7907, and 17581.6 of, and to add Section 17581.97 to, the Government Code, to amend Section 1596.792 of, and to add Section 1596.7925 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 26205.5 of the Public Resources Code, and to repeal Section 4 of Chapter 1335 of the Statutes of 1992, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Education finance: education omnibus trailer bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB842 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET pursuant to Assembly Rule 97. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 24. Page 5802.) |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4919.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.) |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |