CA SB842 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From committee without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14575 and 14585 of, to amend and repeal Section 14581 of, and to add and repeal Sections 14572.3 and 14575.2 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to recycling, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
California Beverage Container Recycling and Litter
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2016-06-27 - Assembly - SB 842 B.& F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB842 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB842 Committee On B. & F.R. (Leno) (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | From committee without further action. |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-27 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-06-27 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 5509.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 5509.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5511.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-05-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 3541.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-01-08 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 7. |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 14575 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14581 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14585 | Amended Code | Citation Text |