CA SB841 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the Budget Act of 2017 (Chapter 14 of the Statutes of 2017) by augmenting Item 9840-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2017: augmentation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Assembly - SB 841 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB 841 B.F.& R. (Mitchell) (Y: 29 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB841 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-27 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2018.
2018-06-27 Approved by the Governor.
2018-06-18SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-06-14SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 4683.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-06-14SenateUnanimous consent granted to take up without reference to file.
2018-06-14SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-06-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5805.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-14AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 5803.)
2018-06-14AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-06-14AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-06-14AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 55. Noes 23. Page 5803.)
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4919.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-30SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-04-30SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.)
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback