CA SB84 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44060.5, 44125, 44272, 44272.4, and 44274 of, and to add Section 44272.1 to, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 9250.1, 9261.1, and 9853.6 of the Vehicle Code, relating to air pollution, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Air quality programs: funding.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Environmental Quality] (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Senate | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Gonzalez. |
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1160.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 936.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-14 | Senate | Set for hearing April 26. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 10. Noes 4. Page 688.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on TRANS. and E.Q. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13. |
2023-01-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 44060.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44272 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44272.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44272.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 44274 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 9250.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 9261.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 9853.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |