CA SB837 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 48000 of the Education Code, relating to transitional kindergarten.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transitional kindergarten: enrollment for 4-year-olds.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25SenateMay 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-23SenateApril 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 4622.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-22SenateSet for hearing April 11.
2018-03-21SenateApril 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-03-06SenateSet for hearing April 4.
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-01-09SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 8.
2018-01-08SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code48000Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback