CA SB833 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 617, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on September 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 617, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 8593.7 to the Government Code, relating to emergencies.
Title
Emergencies: Office of Emergency Services: guidelines: alert and warning systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike McGuire [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D] |
Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Jim Wood [D] | Sen. Ling Ling Chang [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB833 McGuire et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 833 McGuire Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB833 McGuire et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 833 McGuire Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB833 McGuire et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-21 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 617, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-21 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-09-05 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5875.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-27 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6578.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-20 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-06-20 | Assembly | June 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-05-31 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4451.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4298.) (May 25). |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | April 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4604.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2018-01-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 4. |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8588.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8593.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8594.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |