CA SB833 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on August 28 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-09-05 - Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 8593.7 to the Government Code, relating to emergencies.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Emergencies: Office of Emergency Services: guidelines: alert and warning systems.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB833 McGuire et al. Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-27 - Assembly - SB 833 McGuire Senate Third Reading By AGUIAR-CURRY (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Special Consent SB833 McGuire et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-05SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
2018-08-28SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5875.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-27AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-20AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 28).
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
2018-06-20AssemblyJune 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2018-06-04AssemblyReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4451.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4298.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-04-23SenateApril 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2018-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4604.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-03-15SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2018-01-05SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 4.
2018-01-04SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code8588.4New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8593.7New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8594.6New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback