CA SB828 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - July 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act relating to state real property, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Surplus state real property: disposal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB828 G.O (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-07AssemblyJuly 7 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2021-06-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Com. on A. & A.R.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-01SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1205.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-04SenateMay 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-22SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0. Page 857.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-15SenateSet for hearing April 20.
2021-04-14SenateReferred to Com. on G.O.
2021-04-07SenateFrom printer.
2021-04-06SenateArticle IV Section 8(a) of the Constitution and Joint Rule 55 dispensed with February 22, 2021, suspending the 30 calendar day requirement.
2021-04-06SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback