CA SB828 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 974, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 65584, 65584.01, and 65584.04 of the Government Code, relating to land use.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Land use: housing element.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB828 Wiener Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 828 Wiener Senate Third Reading By BLOOM (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Assembly - SB 828 Wiener Senate Third Reading Amend By BLOOM Set #1 (Y: 46 N: 23 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB828 Wiener (Y: 23 N: 10 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 974, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-30 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 6025.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-29SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 6767.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-24AssemblyRead third time and amended. (Ayes 46. Noes 23. Page 6562.)
2018-08-24AssemblyAssembly Rule 69 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 23. Page 6540.)
2018-08-21AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 16).
2018-08-08AssemblyAugust 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-07-02AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-06-28AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 27).
2018-06-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
2018-06-18AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2018-06-11AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and L. GOV.
2018-05-31AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-30SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 10. Page 4422.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-29SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-05-25SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2018-05-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4297.) (May 25).
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 25.
2018-05-14SenateMay 14 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-04-26SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4821.) (April 24).
2018-04-16SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2018-03-21SenateRe-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-03-14SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3.
2018-01-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback