CA SB818 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-11 - July 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-07-11 - July 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Business and Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 130 and 144 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to consumer affairs.
Title
Department of Consumer Affairs: terms of office: fingerprinting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB818 Roth (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-07-11 | Assembly | July 11 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 589.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 535.) (March 27). |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 27. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 144 | Amended Code | Citation Text |