CA SB818 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 404, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 404, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2924 of, to amend and repeal Sections 2923.4, 2923.5, 2923.6, 2923.7, 2924.12, 2924.15, and 2924.17 of, to add Sections 2923.55, 2924.9, 2924.10, 2924.18, and 2924.19 to, to repeal Section 2920.5 of, and to repeal and add Section 2924.11 of, the Civil Code, relating to mortgages.
Title
Mortgages and deeds of trust: foreclosure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB818 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 818 Beall Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB818 Beall et al (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - [04-25-2018] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 818 Beall Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB818 Beall et al (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - [04-25-2018] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 404, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-24 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 5420.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6309.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-26 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on B. & F. and JUD. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 5008.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Set for hearing May 7. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4812.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | April 24 set for first hearing. Reconsideration of favorable vote granted. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 4812.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 4532.) (April 4). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 4. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on I., B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2018-01-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 3. |
2018-01-03 | Senate | (Corrected March 20). |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 2923.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2923.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2923.55 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 2923.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2923.7 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2924 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2924.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 2924.12 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2924.15 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2924.17 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 2924.18 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 2924.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Civil Code | 2924.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |