CA SB816 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 723, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 723, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 2881.2, 2987, 2988, 4531.1, 4836.2, 5134, 5681, 5800, 5801, 5801.1, 5802, 5803, 5804, 5805, 5807, 5812, 12703.1, 12704, and 12709 of, to amend, renumber, and add Section 5811.1 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 4119.01, 4119.11, 4128.2, 4161, 4202.5, 4210, and 4400 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to professions and vocations, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Professions and vocations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB816 Roth Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Assembly - SB 816 Roth Senate Third Reading By Berman (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB816 Roth (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-09-13 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-09-12 - Assembly - SB 816 Roth Senate Third Reading By Berman (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB816 Roth (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 723, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-21 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |
2023-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 9. Page 2839.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-09-13 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 2769.) |
2023-09-12 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2683.) Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2023-09-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2023-09-12 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-09-12 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 11. Page 3265.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-08 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2023-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (September 1). |
2023-08-16 | Assembly | August 16 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2023-07-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 2.) (July 11). |
2023-06-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1257.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 854.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E. D. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |