CA SB803 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 454, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on October 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 454, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 7510 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 63.1, 68, 401.10, 423.3, 480, 482, 2609, and 3726 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Property taxation.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Sen. Edward Hernandez [D] |
Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB803 Committee On GOV. & F. (Hertzberg) Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Assembly - SB 803 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day By TING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB803 Committee On GOV. & F. (Hertzberg) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-01 - Assembly - SB 803 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day By TING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB803 Committee On GOV. & F. (Hertzberg) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 454, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2426.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-01 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2751.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-08-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-07-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 13). |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-06-24 | Assembly | June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2015-05-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1029.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 11. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 816.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 24. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7510 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 2609 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 3726 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 401.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 423.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 480 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 482 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 63.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 68 | Amended Code | Citation Text |