CA SB800 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 448, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 448, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12739.61 of, and to add Part 6.8 (commencing with Section 12739.77) to Division 2 of, the Insurance Code, and to add Section 14005.277 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to health.
Title
Health care coverage programs: transition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB800 Lara Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 800 Lara Senate Third Reading By PAN (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB800 Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-11 - Senate - From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-09 - Assembly - SB 800 Lara Senate Third Reading By PAN (Y: 53 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB800 Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 448, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-23 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2407.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-11 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 2390.) |
2013-09-10 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2276.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-09-09 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 25. Page 3024.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 30). |
2013-08-21 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2013-08-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-08-06 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-07-02 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-06-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-29 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1168.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1020.) (May 23). |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2013-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 792.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 100500 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 12739.61 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 12739.77 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14005.275 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14005.277 | New Code | See Bill Text |