CA SB798 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1708.87 to the Civil Code, relating to civil law.
Title
Unsolicited lewd images.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-01-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1708.87 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB798 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB798 |