CA SB795 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 22 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-09 - Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 5096.9, 5096.20, and 5096.21 of, to amend and repeal Sections 5072, 5096, 5096.1, 5096.2, 5096.4, 5096.5, 5096.6, 5096.7, and 5096.12 of, to add Section 5096.22 to, and to repeal Sections 5096.3, 5096.10, 5096.13, 5096.14, and 5096.15 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to accountancy, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Accountancy: practice privileges.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB795 Galgiani (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-09AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-08AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8).
2018-07-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-02AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2018-06-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-04-19AssemblyReferred to Com. on B. & P.
2018-01-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4069.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-17SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-01-16SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-01-12SenateSet for hearing January 16.
2018-01-10SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-01-09SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3098.) (January 8).
2017-12-21SenateSet for hearing January 8.
2017-04-18SenateApril 24 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2017-04-03SenateApril 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-03-28SenateSet for hearing April 17.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code5072Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5096Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5096.1Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5096.10Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5096.12Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5096.13Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5096.14Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5096.15Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5096.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5096.20Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5096.21Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5096.22Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5096.3Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5096.4Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5096.5Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5096.6Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5096.7Repealed CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5096.8Amended CodeCitation Text
Business and Professions Code5096.9Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback