CA SB794 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-24 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-06-24 - Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Section 231 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to juries.
Title
Juries: criminal trials: peremptory challenges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB794 Evans (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-24 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2014-01-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 11. Page 2668.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-17 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2591.) (January 14). |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Set for hearing January 14. |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 231 | Amended Code | Citation Text |