CA SB787 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 331, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 331, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 14502 of the Corporations Code, and to amend Sections 25988, 122137, and 122323 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to animal welfare.
Title
Animal welfare.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB787 AGRI. (Galgiani) Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 787 AGRI. Senate Third Reading By EGGMAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - SB 787 AGRI. Senate Third Reading By EGGMAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB787 AGRI. (Galgiani) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-03 - Assembly - SB 787 AGRI. Senate Third Reading By EGGMAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - SB 787 AGRI. Senate Third Reading By EGGMAN (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB787 AGRI. (Galgiani) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 331, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2531.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2961.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2019-08-12 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-07-08 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2570.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 11). |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 964.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 890.) (April 30). |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 14. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 14502 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 122137 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 122323 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25988 | Amended Code | Citation Text |