CA SB785 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 931, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 931, Statutes of 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Sections 14661 and 14661.1 of the Government Code, to amend, repeal, and add Section 32132.5 of the Health and Safety Code, to amend Section 20209.14 of, to add and repeal Article 6 (commencing with Section 10187) of Chapter 1 of Part 2 of Division 2 of, to add and repeal Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 22160) of Part 3 of Division 2 of, to repeal Sections 20133, 20175.2, 20193, 20301.5, and 20688.6 of, and to repeal Article 22 (commencing with Section 20360) of Chapter 1 of Part 3 of Division 2 of, the Public Contract Code, to add Section 37.2 to the San Diego Unified Port District Act (Chapter 67 of the First Extraordinary Session of the Statutes of 1962), and to repeal Section 6 of Chapter 2 of the Second Extraordinary Session of the Statutes of 2009, relating to design-build.
Title
Design-build.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB785 Wolk Concurrence (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 785 Wolk Senate Third Reading By FRAZIER (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB785 Wolk (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-26 - Assembly - SB 785 Wolk Senate Third Reading By FRAZIER (Y: 68 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2014-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-25 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB785 Wolk (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Governance and Finance (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 931, Statutes of 2014. | |
2014-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4907.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 68. Noes 5. Page 6486.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Page 6340.) Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2014-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 6). |
2014-08-04 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2014-01-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2653.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-01-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-01-14 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2013-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Wolk. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 990.) (May 20). |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 752.) (May 1). |
2013-04-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 466.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and GOV. & F. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14661 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14661.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 32132.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 10186 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 10187 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 20133 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20175.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20193 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20209 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20209.14 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20301.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20688.6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 22160 | New Code | See Bill Text |