CA SB784 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 647 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Crimes: disorderly conduct: invasion of privacy.
Sponsors
Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] | Sen. Joel Anderson [R] | Asm. Matt Dababneh [D] | Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] |
Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Asm. Randy Voepel [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 784 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By DABABNEH (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB784 Galgiani et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Privacy and Consumer Protection] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB784 Galgiani et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2017-10-04 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-04 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3484.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta. |
2017-06-29 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 28). |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-06-13 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on P. & C.P. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and P. & C.P. |
2017-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1136.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 856.) (April 25). |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | April 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 647 | Amended Code | Citation Text |