CA SB780 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 634, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 634, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 14902.1 to the Food and Agricultural Code, relating to food and agriculture.
Title
Department of Food and Agriculture: oversight: commercial feed, feed additives, and drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB780 Alvarado-Gil Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-08-17 - Assembly - SB 780 Alvarado-Gil Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB780 Alvarado-Gil (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-08-17 - Assembly - SB 780 Alvarado-Gil Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-07-12 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-21 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-04 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB780 Alvarado-Gil (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 634, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2023-09-15 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2592.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-08-17 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2023-08-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2743.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-07-13 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 12). |
2023-06-21 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2023-05-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1004.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 768.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on AGRI. |
2023-03-21 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Food and Agricultural Code | 14902.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |