CA SB778 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 215, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 215, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 12950.1 of the Government Code, relating to employment, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Employers: sexual harassment training: requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-15 - Assembly - SB 778 L., P.E. & R. Third Reading Urgency By KALRA (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB778 L., P.E. & R. (Hill) Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB778 L., P.E. & R. (Hill) Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 215, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-08-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-23 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-08-15 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2725.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta. |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26). |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 924.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 655.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12950.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |