CA SB778 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 215, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 12950.1 of the Government Code, relating to employment, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Employers: sexual harassment training: requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-08-15 - Assembly - SB 778 L., P.E. & R. Third Reading Urgency By KALRA (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB778 L., P.E. & R. (Hill) Urgency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 215, Statutes of 2019.
2019-08-30 Approved by the Governor.
2019-08-23SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-08-15SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-08-15AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2725.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-07-05AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-07-05AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Bonta.
2019-06-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2019-06-12AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-05-16AssemblyReferred to Com. on L. & E.
2019-05-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-02SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 924.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-04-23SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2019-04-22SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-12SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-04-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 655.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-04-01SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2019-02-27SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
2019-02-26SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code12950.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback