CA SB766 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 18 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 1.5 (commencing with Section 1297.185) to Chapter 5 of Title 9.3 of Part 3 of the Code of Civil Procedure, relating to international commercial disputes.
Title
International commercial arbitration: representation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-05 - Assembly - SB 766 Monning Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB766 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB766 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 134, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-07-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-07-11 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6107.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-06-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 27). |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-01-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4116.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-01-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-01-13 | Senate | Set for hearing January 16. |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4021.) (January 9). |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 9. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 1297.185 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Water Code | 9251 | Amended Code | Citation Text |