CA SB76 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-27 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Chapter 10.6 (commencing with Section 3539.75) of Division 4 of Title 1 of the Government Code, relating to state employees.
Title
Excluded employees: binding arbitration.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-09-07 - Assembly - SB 76 Nielsen Senate Third Reading By REYES (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB76 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-07-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-01 - Senate - Special Consent SB76 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-27 | Senate | Veto sustained. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Stricken from file. |
2021-10-07 | Senate | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. |
2021-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2021-09-07 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2818.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-07-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1341.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1182.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 858.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Set for hearing April 20. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 670.) (April 5). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Set for hearing April 5. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-12-16 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 15. |
2020-12-15 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 3539.75 | New Code | See Bill Text |