CA SB754 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
Pending: Senate Banking and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 7 (commencing with Section 44558) to Chapter 1 of Division 27 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to economic development, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Economic development: low- to moderate-income communities: Equity in Lending and Fair Recovery Act.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-21SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
2021-04-01SenateApril 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-03-19SenateSet for hearing April 7.
2021-03-18SenateRe-referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and B., P. & E.D.
2021-03-10SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-22SenateRead first time.
2021-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code44558New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback