CA SB753 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-22 - Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 11358 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to cannabis.
Title
Cannabis: water resources.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Caballero [D] | Asm. Megan Dahle [R] | Sen. Brian Dahle [R] | Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D] |
Sen. Henry Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources and Water] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 18. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | May 8 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 900.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on N.R. & W. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 660.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB S. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 11. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB S. and N.R. & W. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11358 | Amended Code | Citation Text |