CA SB753 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-07-27 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Article 24 (commencing with Section 70050) to Chapter 2 of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, to amend Section 8400 of, to add Sections 8390, 8391, 8392, and 8393 to, to add the heading of Chapter 5.6 (commencing with Section 8390) to Division 1 of Title 2 of, and to repeal the heading of Chapter 5.6 (commencing with Section 8400) of Division 1 of Title 2 of, the Government Code, relating to CalServe.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CalServe.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB753 Stern (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2020-07-09AssemblyJuly 20 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
2020-01-27AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-01-27SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3150.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-01-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-01-21SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2020-01-16SenateSet for hearing January 21.
2020-01-15SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-01-14SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3088.) (January 14).
2020-01-07SenateSet for hearing January 14.
2020-01-06SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-04-23SenateApril 23 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 23.
2019-04-10SenateRe-referred to Com. on JUD.
2019-04-04SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Education Code70050New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8390New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8391New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8392New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8393New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code8400Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback