CA SB746 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 876, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 876, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 84512 to the Government Code, relating to the Political Reform Act of 1974.
Title
Political Reform Act of 1974: business entities: online advocacy and advertisements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-31 - Assembly - SB 746 Skinner Senate Third Reading By Gabriel (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB746 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB746 Skinner (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB746 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-08-17 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-08-10 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB746 Skinner (Y: 29 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 876, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-09-09 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. | |
2022-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5382.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2022-08-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 17). |
2022-08-15 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2022-08-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-08-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 10). |
2022-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-05-12 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on ELECTIONS pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2022-05-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2022-05-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on P. & C.P. |
2022-01-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 6. Page 2806.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2022-01-03 | Senate | From inactive file on motion of Senator Skinner. |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Skinner. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1203.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2021-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1. Page 688.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 84512 | New Code | See Bill Text |