CA SB74 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's item veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's item veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act making appropriations for the support of the government of the State of California and for several public purposes in accordance with the provisions of Section 12 of Article IV of the Constitution of the State of California, relating to the state budget, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-15 - Assembly - SB 74 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 61 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB74 Mitchell (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB74 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB74 Mitchell (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB74 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's item veto pending. | |
2020-06-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 6, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-06-29 | Approved by the Governor with item veto. | |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m. |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 3714.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Consent granted to take up without reference to file. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 3714.) |
2020-06-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 15. Page 4857.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2020-06-15 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 4848.) |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 663.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |