CA SB736 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-30 - August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Article 8 (commencing with Section 12100.100) to Chapter 1.6 of Part 2 of Division 3 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to state government.
Title
Creative Economy Incentive Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-07-09 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB736 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Jobs, Economic Development, and the Economy] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB736 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-30 | Assembly | August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)). |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 9). |
2019-07-01 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D., & E. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D., & E. |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Re-referred to Coms. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. and J., E.D., & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on J., E.D., & E. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1281.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1108.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 770.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | April 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on EQ. and TRANS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 12100.100 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |