CA SB735 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 10824.5 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public social services: accommodation: notification.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-07-05 - Assembly - SB 735 Leyva Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB735 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 155, Statutes of 2019.
2019-07-30 Approved by the Governor.
2019-07-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2019-07-05SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-07-05AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 2549.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-06-27AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-06-26AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 26).
2019-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-06-19AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Com. on HUM. S.
2019-05-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-09SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1004.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-07SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-05-06SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2019-04-26SenateSet for hearing May 6.
2019-04-23SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 776.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2019-04-03SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on HUMAN S.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Welfare and Institutions Code10824.5Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback