CA SB731 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 814, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on September 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-09-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 814, Statutes of 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 44242.5 and 44346 of the Education Code, and to amend Sections 1203.41 and 11105 of, and to amend, repeal, and add Sections 851.93 and 1203.425 of, the Penal Code, relating to criminal records.
Title
Criminal records: relief.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-08-18 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB731 Durazo et al. Concurrence (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - SB 731 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Ting (Y: 46 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Assembly - SB 731 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Ting Amendment Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Assembly - SB 731 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Ting (Y: 35 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB731 Durazo et al (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-29 - Assembly - SB 731 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Ting (Y: 46 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2022-06-23 - Assembly - SB 731 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Ting Amendment Set #1 (Y: 49 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-09-10 - Assembly - SB 731 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Ting (Y: 35 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2021-08-26 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB731 Durazo et al (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-09-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 814, Statutes of 2022. | |
2022-09-29 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2022-08-26 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. | |
2022-08-18 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 4897.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 22. Page 5627.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-23 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 17. Page 5509.) |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2022-06-21 | Assembly | From inactive file. |
2022-06-20 | Assembly | Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Ting. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Reyes. |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. |
2021-09-10 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Ting. |
2021-09-10 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 28. Page 3166.) | |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2021-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2021-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-08-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-08-26 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26). |
2021-08-19 | Assembly | August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2021-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-06-23 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 7. Page 1378.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2021-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1202.) (May 20). |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2021-05-04 | Senate | May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 778.) (April 13). |
2021-04-05 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 13. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | April 6 hearing postponed by committee. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 44242.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 44346 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1203.41 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1203.425 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 851.93 | Amended Code | Citation Text |