CA SB728 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 359, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 359, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 43845 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to air pollution.
Title
Air pollution: parking cash-out program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB728 Lowenthal (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Assembly - SB 728 Lowenthal Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-20 - Assembly - SB 728 Lowenthal Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD Amend By BLUMENFIELD Set #1 (Y: 48 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB728 Lowenthal (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-04 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-24 - Assembly - SB 728 Lowenthal Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 45 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-08-20 - Assembly - SB 728 Lowenthal Senate Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD Amend By BLUMENFIELD Set #1 (Y: 48 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB728 Lowenthal (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-04 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 359, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-10-11 | Approved by Governor. | |
2009-09-11 | Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m. | |
2009-09-04 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 18. Page 2215.) To enrollment. | |
2009-08-24 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-08-24 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 29. Page 2712.) To Senate. | |
2009-08-20 | Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 48. Noes 29. Page 2664.) To third reading. | |
2009-07-01 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-06-30 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on June 29.) | |
2009-06-08 | To Com. on TRANS. | |
2009-05-26 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-26 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 1008.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-18 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2009-05-14 | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 885.) From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 939.) | |
2009-05-13 | Set for hearing May 14 in T. & H. pending suspension of rules. | |
2009-05-07 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |
2009-05-06 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-05-04 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 755.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |
2009-04-28 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2009-04-27 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |
2009-03-19 | To Coms. on EQ. and JUD. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-02-28 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |