CA SB720 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-06 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Hearing: Aug 15 @ 9:00 am in State Capitol, Room 4202
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 51227.3 to the Education Code, and to amend Section 71301 of the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Environmental education: environmental principles and concepts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Education] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB720 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-05AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 27).
2018-06-20AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-06-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18).
2018-06-07AssemblyRe-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2018-06-06AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-04-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-01-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-01-29SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4115.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-01-11SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-01-10SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4019.) (January 10).
2018-01-05SenateSet for hearing January 10.
2018-01-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-01-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on RLS.
2018-01-03SenateWithdrawn from committee.
2018-01-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on JUD.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations


California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback