CA SB713 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 1793.22 of the Civil Code, relating to consumer protection.
Title
Tanner Consumer Protection Act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | May 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 9. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1793.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB713 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180SB713 |