CA SB706 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 64, 480.1, 480.2, and 482 of, to add Section 480.9 to, and to add and repeal Section 486 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Property taxation: change in ownership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-06 - Senate - [First] hearing set for [05-06-2021]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 1 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | May 6 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 3. Page 1045.) Reconsideration granted. |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | (Ayes 32. Noes 4.) |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Read first time. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 480.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 480.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 480.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 482 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 486 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 64 | Amended Code | Citation Text |