CA SB704 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 871.6 and 871.8 to, to repeal Section 872 of, and to repeal and add Section 878 of, the Public Utilities Code, relating to telecommunications.
Title
Telecommunications: Moore Universal Telephone Service Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB704 Bradford et al. Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 704 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB704 Bradford (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 704 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Eduardo Garcia (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB704 Bradford (Y: 27 N: 7 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Veto sustained. | |
2020-01-13 | Stricken from file. | |
2019-10-13 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-10-13 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 7. Page 2884.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 2. Page 3343.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on C. & C. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 7. Page 1192.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 1107.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2. Page 842.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities Code | 871.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 871.8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 872 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |