CA SB704 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 247, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 64.2 to the Harbors and Navigation Code, relating to harbors and navigation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Division of Boating and Waterways: invasive aquatic plants control programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 704 Galgiani Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB704 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-11 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 247, Statutes of 2017.
2017-09-11 Approved by the Governor.
2017-08-30SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2017-08-24SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2017-08-24AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2770.) Ordered to the Senate.
2017-07-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-07-19AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
2017-06-27AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-06-06AssemblyJune 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2017-06-01AssemblyReferred to Com. on W.,P., & W.
2017-05-23AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2017-05-22SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1150.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2017-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-15SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2017-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 15.
2017-05-03SenateMay 8 hearing postponed by committee.
2017-05-02SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-05-01SenateSet for hearing May 8.
2017-04-25SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 828.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2017-03-14SenateSet for hearing April 25.
2017-03-09SenateReferred to Com. on N.R. & W.
2017-02-21SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Harbors and Navigation Code64.2New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback