CA SB703 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 578, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 578, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 10295.35 to the Public Contract Code, relating to public contracts.
Title
Public contracts: prohibitions: discrimination.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Leno [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-09-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB703 Leno Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Assembly - SB 703 Leno Senate Third Reading By GORDON (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB703 Leno (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-02 - Assembly - SB 703 Leno Senate Third Reading By GORDON (Y: 53 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-01 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB703 Leno (Y: 25 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-04 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Judiciary (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-07 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 578, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-07 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 12. Page 2496.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-09-02 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-09-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 24. Page 2789.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-09-01 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-31 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27). |
2015-07-15 | Assembly | July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on A. & A.R. |
2015-06-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 1300.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1159.) (May 28). |
2015-05-23 | Senate | Set for hearing May 28. |
2015-05-04 | Senate | May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 4. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 728.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Set for hearing April 21. |
2015-04-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 592.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Set for hearing April 14. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time. |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Contract Code | 10295.35 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 10421.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Contract Code | 10427 | New Code | See Bill Text |