CA SB702 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 1305 to the Government Code, relating to state government.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gubernatorial appointments: report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-07-13 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB702 Limón et al (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-10 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-13AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 1.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-07-01AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-06-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 30).
2021-06-10AssemblyReferred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and JUD.
2021-06-02AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2021-06-02SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-05-24SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2021-05-20SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2021-05-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1201.) (May 20).
2021-05-14SenateSet for hearing May 20.
2021-05-10SenateMay 10 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-30SenateSet for hearing May 10.
2021-04-28SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 937.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-21SenateSet for hearing April 27.
2021-04-21SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
2021-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 857.) (April 20).
2021-04-14SenateSet for hearing April 20.
2021-03-24SenateRe-referred to Coms. on G.O. and JUD.
2021-03-15SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-22SenateRead first time.
2021-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code1305New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback