CA SB697 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 26 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-06-10 - Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 16755 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to business.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Conspiracy against trade: punishment.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB697 Hurtado (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-01 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-06-10AssemblyRe-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
2024-05-20AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2023-06-28AssemblyJune 28 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2023-06-21AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
2023-06-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on INS.
2023-05-26AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2023-05-26SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 1328.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2023-05-18SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2023-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 1180.) (May 18).
2023-05-12SenateSet for hearing May 18.
2023-05-01SenateMay 1 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2023-04-21SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2023-04-20SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 833.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2023-04-11SenateSet for hearing April 19.
2023-03-01SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2023-02-17SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19.
2023-02-16SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code16755Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback