CA SB696 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Veto sustained.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5001 of, and to add Section 5201 to, the Elections Code, relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Elections: political parties.
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-13 - Senate - 09/12/19 (Y: 4 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB696 Umberg Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 696 Umberg Third Reading Urgency By Low (Y: 64 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB696 Umberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB696 Umberg Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - That the Assembly amendments be concurred in (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 696 Umberg Third Reading Urgency By Low (Y: 64 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB696 Umberg (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Veto sustained. | |
2020-01-13 | Stricken from file. | |
2019-10-09 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2019-10-09 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2928.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 2908.) |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Set for hearing September 12. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2808.) Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 14. Page 3342.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 30). |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 3). |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 924.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 771.) (April 23). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 5001 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 5201 | New Code | See Bill Text |