CA SB691 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Hearing: May 20 in Senate Chamber
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 17052 and 17052.1 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Personal Income Tax Law: Earned Income Tax Credit: Young Child Tax Credit.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-03 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04SenateMay 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
2021-04-27SenateSet for hearing May 3.
2021-04-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2021-04-15SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-04-13SenateSet for hearing April 22.
2021-04-12SenateApril 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2021-04-06SenateSet for hearing April 15.
2021-03-18SenateRe-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2021-03-11SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2021-03-03SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-02-22SenateJoint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
2021-02-22Senate(Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
2021-02-22SenateArt. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
2021-02-22SenateRead first time.
2021-02-22SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 24.
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17052Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code17052.1Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback