CA SB687 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on October 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-03 - Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5914 and 5920 of, and to add Chapter 9.2 (commencing with Section 5940) to Part 2 of Division 2 of Title 1 of, the Corporations Code, and to amend Sections 1254 and 1255.1 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to health facilities.
Title
Health facilities: emergency services: Attorney General.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-15 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB687 Skinner Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 687 Skinner Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - (Y: 11 N: 28 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 687 Skinner Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 36 N: 28 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB687 Skinner (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-15 - Assembly - SB 687 Skinner Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 46 N: 26 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - (Y: 11 N: 28 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-09-14 - Assembly - SB 687 Skinner Senate Third Reading By WOOD (Y: 36 N: 28 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-09-01 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 11 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB687 Skinner (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-03 | Last day to consider Governor’s veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2017-10-14 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2017-10-14 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2017-09-22 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 1129.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-15 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 26. Page 3481.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-15 | Assembly | Reconsideration granted. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Wood. |
2017-09-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 36. Noes 28. Page 3429.) |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (September 1). |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-07-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2.) (July 11). |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 11. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-06-15 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 1343.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Published May 26 at 9 p.m. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1189.) (May 25). |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 25. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 853.) (April 25). |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 808.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 5914 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5920 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 5940 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1254 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1255.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |