CA SB681 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 20570.1 to the Government Code, relating to public employees’ retirement.
Title
Public employees’ retirement: contracting agencies: termination.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Senate - [Second] hearing set for [01-08-2018]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-01-08 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | January 8 set for second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 3. Page 4005.) Reconsideration granted. |
2017-12-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 8. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | April 24 set for first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24 in P.E. & R. pending receipt. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 20570.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |