CA SB681 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 726, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 10 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 726, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 20652 of the Public Contract Code, relating to public postsecondary education.
Title
Community college districts: personal property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-09-03 - Assembly - SB 681 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By CALDERON (Y: 72 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB681 Hernandez (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB681 Hernandez (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-01 - Senate - Do pass and be placed on the Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-10 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 726, Statutes of 2013. | |
2013-10-10 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2013-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2013-09-03 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-09-03 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 4. Page 2831.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-08-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2013-08-07 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (August 6). |
2013-06-11 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-05-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 867.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 788.) (May 1). |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 66746 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Contract Code | 20652 | Amended Code | Citation Text |