CA SB681 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Died on Senate inactive file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-01 - Died on Senate inactive file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6103.1 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 1052, 1055, 1055.2, 1126, 1525, 1535, 1538, 1551, 1825, 1831, 1845, 2525, 2526, 2550, 2763.5, 5100, 5101, 5103, 5106, and 5107 of, to add Sections 1051.1, 1240.5, 1846, and 1847 to, to add Chapter 3.5 (commencing with Section 1110) to Part 1 of Division 2 of, and to repeal Section 5108 of, the Water Code, relating to water.
Title
Water diversion and use.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB681 Pavley (Y: 19 N: 19 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2009-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB681 Pavley Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB681 Pavley Reconsider (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-28 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-28 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-01 | Died on Senate inactive file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |
2009-06-03 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 19. Page 1199.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Pavley. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1199.) Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Pavley. | |
2009-06-01 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1074.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |
2009-05-22 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |
2009-05-11 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |
2009-05-01 | Set for hearing May 11. | |
2009-04-28 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 684.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2009-04-20 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2009-04-01 | Set for hearing April 28. | |
2009-03-19 | To Com. on N.R. & W. | |
2009-03-02 | Read first time. | |
2009-03-01 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 31. | |
2009-02-27 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |