CA SB676 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 484, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 740.16 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to transportation electrification.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation electrification: electric vehicles: grid integration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB676 Bradford et al. Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 676 Bradford Senate Third Reading By Boerner Horvath (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-21 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Communications and Conveyance] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB676 Bradford et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-02 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 484, Statutes of 2019.
2019-10-02 Approved by the Governor.
2019-09-19SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
2019-09-11SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2870.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2019-09-11SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2019-09-10SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2019-09-10AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3347.) Ordered to the Senate.
2019-09-06AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2019-09-06AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2019-08-30AssemblyFrom consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
2019-08-22AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2019-08-21AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 21).
2019-07-10AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-07-05AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2019-07-03AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on C. & C. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on C. & C.
2019-07-01AssemblyAssembly Rule 56 suspended.
2019-06-19AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & E.
2019-06-19AssemblyJune 26 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Coms. on U. & E. and C. & C.
2019-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1161.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-15SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-05-15SenateRead third time and amended.
2019-05-14SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-13SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2019-05-03SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2019-05-01SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-30SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 842.) (April 24).
2019-04-05SenateSet for hearing April 24.
2019-04-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
2019-03-27SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2019-03-14SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2019-02-25SenateRead first time.
2019-02-25SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
2019-02-22SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Public Utilities Code740.16New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback