CA SB675 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 3.5 (commencing with Section 51727) to Chapter 5 of Part 28 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Education Code, and to amend Section 8880.4.5 of the Government Code, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Education finance: Computer Occupations and Developing Education (CODE) Act: State Lottery Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 548.) (April 3). |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 3. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | April 10 hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and G.O. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 51727 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8880.4.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |